+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 4 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 4 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 11 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 defeated
- Amendment SA 2 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 5 YES 13 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Laid On Table in Senate
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On November 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor