+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor