+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 Favorable
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 Favorable
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Re-Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor