+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 333 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 NO
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
: House Vote
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 5
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21