+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Laid On Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Laid On Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Stricken
- Laid On Table in Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor