+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor