+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
On June 6, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On May 5, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
On May 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 30 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 30 - Stricken in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 30 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 30 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1
This Amendment clarifies that sawmills are subject to permit requirements under Chapter 60, Title 7, which also ensures that sawmills are subject to regulations adopted under Chapter 60.
SA 2
This Amendment makes clear that the exemption does not apply in the coastal zone, as defined in § 7002(i), Title 7 of the Coastal Zone Act.
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
: House Vote
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor