+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41