+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 292 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 292 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor