+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enact w/o Sign by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor