+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate