+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 270
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - - Stricken in House
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
- SS 1 for SB 270 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 270
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor