+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to SB 267 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (3)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor