+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
On June 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor