+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 4 NO 3 ABSENT
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
- Rules Suspended in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
June 27, 2018: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor