+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor