+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2014: SB 260 Blevins Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
June 19, 2014: SB 260 Blevins Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor