+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 26 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial Committee in Senate
+ − Vote
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor