+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor