+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
- Lifted From Table in House
- Laid On Table in House
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to SB 254
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2014: SB 254 w/HA 1 Townsend Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 30, 2014: HA 1 to SB 254 Spiegelman (House)
June 30, 2014: SB 254 w/HA 1 Townsend Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
June 19, 2014: SB 254 Townsend Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor