+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2 to SB 253
Passed
SA 1 to SB 253
Stricken
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor