+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 32 YES 7 NO 2 ABSENT
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor