+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On March 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor