+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor