+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 20, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Education Committee in House
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
- Laid On Table in Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 18
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor