+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 230 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40