+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor