+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Education Committee in House
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39