+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Technology & Telecommunications) in House with 6 On Its Merits
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Assigned to Technology & Telecommunications Committee in House
On January 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor