+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 4 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 4 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (5)
HA 4 to SB 198
Passed
HA 3 to SB 198
Passed
HA 2 to SB 198
Stricken
HA 1 to SB 198
Stricken
SA 1 to SB 198
Passed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor