+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 defeated
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 5, 2014: SB 197 w/SA 2 Blevins Passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 3
May 6, 2014: SA 1 to SB 197 Lawson Defeated (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 1
May 6, 2014: SA 2 to SB 197 Blevins Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
May 6, 2014: SB 197 w/SA 2 Blevins Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor