+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Energy Committee in House
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 191 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 191 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40