+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 9 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Re-Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
- SS 1 for SB 188 - Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 188
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor