+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor