+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 178
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2014: SB 178 w/SA 1 Peterson Passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 4
April 8, 2014: SA 1 to SB 178 Peterson Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
April 8, 2014: SB 178 w/SA 1 Peterson Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor