+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2 to SB 178
Passed
SA 1 to SB 178
Stricken
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor