+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2 to SB 174
Passed
SA 1 to SB 174
Stricken
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor