+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to SB 170 - Defeated By House. Votes: 20 YES 20 NO 1 ABSENT
- Passed By House. Votes: 21 YES 18 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid On Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Amendment SA 2 to SB 170 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 8 NO 2 NOT VOTING
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 170 - Laid On Table in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 11 YES 10 NO
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 170 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 10
: House Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor