+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 167
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 167 - Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 167 - Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 167 - Lifted From Table in Senate
- SS 1 for SB 167 - - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- SS 1 for SB 167 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 167
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 167
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 167 - Stricken in Senate
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 167 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Laid On Table in Senate
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Housing Committee in Senate