+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Administration Committee in House
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor