+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 157 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38