+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in House
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate