+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Signed by Governor
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 11, 2024 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On May 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 151
On June 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate
+ − Statute Amended
- Session Law 141424 - Chapter: 328, Volume: 84
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor