+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On October 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 151
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - - Stricken in House
- SS 1 for SB 151 - - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 151
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- SS 1 for SB 151 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
- Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 151
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor