+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in House
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to SB 144
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2013: SB 144 w/SA 1 Marshall Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
June 26, 2013: SA 1 to SB 144 Marshall Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 26, 2013: SB 144 w/SA 1 Marshall Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 26, 2013: The Motion on Please type the motion here... Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor