+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Necessary rules are suspended in House
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor