+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 132 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor