+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 13 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment SA 1 to SB 13 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 2 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 ABSENT
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 1
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor