+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Lifted From Table in Senate
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- Laid on Table in Senate
- Laid On Table in Senate
- was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 13
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2014: SS 1 for SB 13 Hall-Long Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2013: SS 1 for SB 13 Hall-Long Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor