+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
+ − Votes (2)
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor